Ryan et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Committee for Public Counsel Services, Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Marian Ryan, Rachael Rollins and Immigration Reform Law Institute
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Todd M. Lyons, Matthew T. Albence and Kevin McAleenan
Amicus Curiae: Prof. Bowie and HIRC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11003
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Genova, Francesca)
February 21, 2020 Filing 85 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Nikolas Bowie on behalf of Prof. Bowie and HIRC. (Bowie, Nikolas)
February 20, 2020 Filing 84 STIPULATION (Joint) on Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Rubio-Spring, Alicia)
February 20, 2020 Filing 83 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Prof. Bowie and HIRC . (Torrey, Philip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 82 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #81 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. The proposed brief is one-half page too long, however, and shall be revised to conform to the 20-page limit set forth in the Local Rules. The revised amicus brief shall be filed promptly and in any event no later than February 24, 2020. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should file the revised amicus brief in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Kelly, Danielle) Modified on 2/19/2020: Edited docket text (Kelly, Danielle).
February 18, 2020 Filing 81 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Prof. Bowie and HIRC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Torrey, Philip)
February 14, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #68 Notice (Other), of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Index to Supplemental Administrative Record, #2 Certification, #3 Supplemental Administrative Record)(Genova, Francesca)
January 31, 2020 Filing 79 Opposition re #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Zimmer, David)
January 28, 2020 Filing 77 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached order. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 27, 2020 Filing 78 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Order. Please see attached order. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 22, 2020 Filing 76 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 1/22/2020. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Def. moved to stay discovery; denied. Discovery to be completed by 7/31/2020. An interim Status Conf. may be set once the MTD is considered. In re to ESI an electronic discovery protocol to be agreed to w/in 2 weeks of receiving initial set of request for prod. of docs. If an agreement as to protocol cannot be reached, contact the clerk and a conf. will be set. Status Conference set for 8/3/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Rubio-Spring, Wiesen, Dacey, Wayne, Nimni, Genova, Sady) (MacDonald, Gail)
January 22, 2020 Filing 75 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Genova, Francesca)
January 22, 2020 Filing 74 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Committee for Public Counsel Services. (Wayne, Wendy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 73 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc.. (Rubio-Spring, Alicia)
January 22, 2020 Filing 72 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Marian Ryan, in her Official Capacity as Middlesex County District Attorney. (Rubio-Spring, Alicia)
January 22, 2020 Filing 71 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Rachael Rollins, in her Official Capacity as Suffolk County District Attorney. (Rubio-Spring, Alicia)
January 22, 2020 Filing 70 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Katherine L. Dacey. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 21, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Katherine L. Dacey Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8064818 by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Katherine Dacey)(Wiesen, Daryl)
January 17, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement of Filing of Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Index to Administrative Record, #2 Certification, #3 Administrative Record)(Genova, Francesca)
January 15, 2020 Filing 67 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zimmer, David)
December 16, 2019 Filing 66 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #64 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference reset to January 22, 2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 13, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, ICE Directive 11072.1, #2 Exhibit B, Enforcement Actions at or Near Courthouses, #3 Exhibit C, ICE Directive 10076.1, #4 Exhibit D, ICE Policy 10036.1)(Genova, Francesca)
December 13, 2019 Filing 64 Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to January 22, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Genova, Francesca)
December 10, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 23, 2019 Filing 62 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re #61 Stipulation. 1. Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss the Complaint on or before December 13, 2019. 2. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss on or before January 31, 2020. 3. Defendants shall file any reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on or before February 28, 2020. Scheduling Conf. to be set by the clerk. (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 12/10/2019, to correct dates in docket entry text (MacDonald, Gail).
October 22, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Zimmer, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 60 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer/Response to Complaint due 10/29/19 from all Defendants. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 23, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jordan Benson (Benson, Jordan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 58 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 28, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Genova, Francesca)
August 21, 2019 Filing 57 USCA Case Number 19-1838 for #55 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence, Kevin McAleenan, Todd M. Lyons. (Paine, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 56 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #55 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #52 Preliminary Injunction, #51 Memorandum & ORDER, Terminate Motions by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Fee Status: US Government. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 9/5/2019. (Kurz, Julian)
June 28, 2019 Filing 54 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #53 . The assented-to motion is allowed in order to permit Defendants' counsel to focus on whether to appeal the court's Order Granting Preliminary Injunction before being required to prepare a response to the complaint. The court does not adopt Defendants' assumption that an appeal of the motion for a preliminary injunction necessarily precludes simultaneous district court litigation. See 16 Charles Alan Wright, Arthur R. Miller & Edward H. Cooper, Federal Practice and Procedure 3921.2 at 58 (3d ed. 2012) ("Ordinarily an interlocutory injunction appeal under [28 U.S.C.] 1292(a)(1) does not defeat the power of the trial court to proceed further with the case."). (Kinsella, Devan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 53 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 27, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Kurz, Julian)
June 20, 2019 Filing 52 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 51 Judge Indira Talwani: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 19, 2019 Filing 49 Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Day Two held on May 28, 2019, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 7/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 30, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 30, 2019 Filing 47 Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on May 23, 2019, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 6/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 46 DIRECTIVE. Filed in open court on May 28, 2019 by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: #1 Attachments). (Kinsella, Devan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 45 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2019 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Marian Ryan, Committee for Public Counsel Services, Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins. Hearing continued from 5/23/19. Case called. Court hears argument from counsel. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Rubio-Spring, Wiesen, Zimmer, Wayne, Nimni, Reuveni, Farquhar) (MacDonald, Gail)
May 23, 2019 Filing 44 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2019 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Marian Ryan, Committee for Public Counsel Services, Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins. Case called. Court hears argument from counsel. Hearing continued to 5/28/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Rubio-Spring, Wiesen, Zimmer, Wayne, Nimni, Reuveni, Farquhar) (MacDonald, Gail)
May 22, 2019 Filing 43 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added CHRISTOPHER J. HAJEC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 21, 2019 Filing 42 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of CHRISTOPHER J. HAJEC Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7695459 by Immigration Reform Law Institute.(Bennion, Bradly) (Main Document 42 replaced on 5/22/2019) (MacDonald, Gail). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2019: #1 Declaration) (MacDonald, Gail).
May 20, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Zimmer, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 40 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Bradly P. Bennion on behalf of Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Bennion, Bradly)
May 17, 2019 Filing 39 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Hajec #35 is DENIED without prejudice. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3(e)(2), the motion should be brought by an attorney who is a member of the bar of this court, who shall also file an appearance. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 38 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute . (Bennion, Bradly)
May 17, 2019 Filing 37 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief #36 . Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Bennion, Bradly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Hajec Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7689166 by Immigration Reform Law Institute.(Bennion, Bradly)
May 15, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Leave to File Granted - May 15, 2019) filed by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Farquhar, Rayford) (Main Document 34 replaced on 5/20/2019) (MacDonald, Gail).
May 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Sady, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 32 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 15, 2019 Filing 31 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting nunc pro tunc #30 Motion for Leave to File Document. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 14, 2019 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Farquhar, Rayford)
May 14, 2019 Filing 29 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan.(Zimmer, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Directive 11072.1: Civil Immigration Enforcement Inside Courthouses (Jan. 10, 2018), #2 Exhibit Enforcement Actions at or Near Courthouses (Mar. 19, 2014), #3 Exhibit Mem. on Prosecutorial Discretion: Certain Victims, Witnesses, and Plaintiffs (June 17, 2011), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Farquhar, Rayford)
May 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca M. Genova on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Genova, Francesca)
May 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Kurz on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Kurz, Julian)
May 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Piemonte, Eve)
May 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Farquhar, Rayford)
May 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan re 21 Notice of Hearing on Motion, Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of the Court's Electronic Notice Setting the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zimmer, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Reuveni, Erez)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Plaintiffs' counsel shall promptly serve a copy of this order on Defendants. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment of the Magistrate Judge. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 3, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
May 3, 2019 Filing 18 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. Pursuant to L.R. 40.1(g)(1) and (4), I find that this case is not related to 18-cv-12452-PBS or 18-cv-10475-PBS and therefore was erroneously assigned to me. The case is returned to the Clerk for random reassignment.(Lara, Miguel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Marian Ryan. Matthew T. Albence served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Todd M. Lyons served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zimmer, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy S. Wayne on behalf of Committee for Public Counsel Services (Wayne, Wendy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Fahey on behalf of Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan (Fahey, Katherine)
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren N. Nimni on behalf of Chelsea Collaborative, Inc. (Nimni, Oren)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J.C. Herbert on behalf of Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan (Herbert, Christopher)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Benson on behalf of Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan (Benson, Jordan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Rubio-Spring on behalf of Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan (Rubio-Spring, Alicia)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl L. Wiesen on behalf of Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan (Wiesen, Daryl)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Zimmer, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Zimmer, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zimmer, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc.. (Zimmer, David)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jacob Zimmer on behalf of Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan (Zimmer, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Matthew T. Albence, Todd M. Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7658975 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Chelsea Collaborative, Inc., Committee for Public Counsel Services, Rachael Rollins, Marian Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Civil Category Sheet)(Zimmer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee for Public Counsel Services
Represented By: Wendy S. Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Collaborative, Inc.
Represented By: Oren N. Nimni
Represented By: Alicia Rubio-Spring
Represented By: Jordan Benson
Represented By: Daryl L. Wiesen
Represented By: David Jacob Zimmer
Represented By: Christopher J.C. Herbert
Represented By: Katherine M. Fahey
Represented By: Katherine L. Dacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Ryan
Represented By: Alicia Rubio-Spring
Represented By: Jordan Benson
Represented By: Daryl L. Wiesen
Represented By: David Jacob Zimmer
Represented By: Christopher J.C. Herbert
Represented By: Katherine M. Fahey
Represented By: Katherine L. Dacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Rollins
Represented By: Alicia Rubio-Spring
Represented By: Jordan Benson
Represented By: Daryl L. Wiesen
Represented By: David Jacob Zimmer
Represented By: Christopher J.C. Herbert
Represented By: Katherine M. Fahey
Represented By: Katherine L. Dacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Bradly P. Bennion
Represented By: Christopher J. Hajec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Julian Kurz
Represented By: Francesca M. Genova
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Julian Kurz
Represented By: Francesca M. Genova
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd M. Lyons
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Julian Kurz
Represented By: Francesca M. Genova
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Julian Kurz
Represented By: Francesca M. Genova
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Represented By: Julian Kurz
Represented By: Francesca M. Genova
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Prof. Bowie and HIRC
Represented By: Philip L. Torrey
Represented By: Nikolas Bowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?