Citizens Bank, National Association v. Silva et al
Plaintiff: Citizens Bank, National Association
Defendant: Jose Silva, Maria C. Silva and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv11004
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/19 cancelled in light of D. 10 (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Counsel to file their summary judgment motion by 7/31/19 or, if no summary judgment motion to be filed, a joint status report. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to date to be determined by the Court by United States of America.(Wozniak, Karen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 11:45 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY(Hourihan, Lisa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 certified copies of state court records and proceedings)(Wozniak, Karen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Wozniak, Karen)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel, Karen Wozniak, by Email. (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 state court complaint, #3 state court return of service as to the United States, #4 state court motion to deposit funds, assess attorney's fees and costs, and withdraw, #5 state court motion to disburse funds)(Wozniak, Karen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019 at request of counsel, as not filed initially when case opened: #6 Category Form) (Lara, Miguel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Bank, National Association v. Silva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Silva
Represented By: Michael Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria C. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Karen Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Bank, National Association
Represented By: Jeremy Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?