Doe v. Lahey Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD and Lahey Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11014
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD, Lahey Health System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Beth Israel Lahey Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Beth Israel Lahey Health, Inc. for Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD, Lahey Health System, Inc... (Jones, Sara)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference... Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD, Lahey Health System, Inc..(Jones, Sara)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered... Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File to June 25, 2019 to File answer to the #1 Complaint, Answer due 6/25/2019 (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 25, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD, Lahey Health System, Inc..(Jones, Sara)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowing #7 Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Lara, Miguel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Schreckinger on behalf of Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD, Lahey Health System, Inc. (Schreckinger, Steven)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 11, 2019 to File Response/Reply by Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD, Lahey Health System, Inc..(Wolfson, Tamara)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019; Lahey Health System, Inc. served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Angueira, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Angueira on behalf of John Doe (Angueira, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7661206 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angueira, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2019 as counsel did not file Category Form initially, form sent through email to Clerk). : #4 Category Form) (Lara, Miguel)).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lahey Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, LTD
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Represented By: Tamara S. Wolfson
Represented By: Sara P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lahey Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Represented By: Tamara S. Wolfson
Represented By: Sara P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: David P. Angueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?