Century Indemnity Company v Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Petitioner: Century Indemnity Company
Respondent: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 1:2019cv11056
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information in Reply filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Mullins, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information in Reply by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London.(Mullins, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #32 Reply to Response to Motion, . (Mullins, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration [REDACTED] filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mullins, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration : Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION re #27 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
June 13, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information by Century Indemnity Company.(Pirozzolo, Jack)
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration (Redacted) filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rachal, Doreen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #2 Opposition (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal)) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 6/14/2019 to attach sealed versions (Pacho, Arnold).
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Doreen M. Rachal on behalf of Century Indemnity Company (Rachal, Doreen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Reply re motion to dismiss of no more than 5 pages no later than 6/27/2019; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Tang, Danni)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London.(Mullins, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/13/2019 to oppose motion to dismiss. (Tang, Danni)
June 5, 2019 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 13, 2019 to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Century's Petition Under Federal Arbitration Act to Compel Arbitration by Century Indemnity Company.(Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered temporarily granting #18 Motion to Seal, subject to the parties' recognition that at some point in the proceedings the court may decide that the information should no longer be impounded. (Zierk, Marsha)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Mullins, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London.(Mullins, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Document received: Proposed Order Granting Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration and Closing Case. (Mullins, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mullins, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Mullins, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #1 Memorandum of Law (Filed Under Seal)) (Pacho, Arnold).
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London.(Mullins, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Mullins on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Mullins, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Century Indemnity Company. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Century Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Brandywine Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Century Indemnity Company.. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack W. Pirozzolo on behalf of Century Indemnity Company (Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Century Indemnity Company. Document received: Proposed Order. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Century Indemnity Company to #1 Complaint,. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint, /Declaration in Support of Petition by Century Indemnity Company. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 Petition Under Federal Arbitration Act to Compel Arbitration against Century Indemnity Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7671911 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Pirozzolo, Jack) Modified on 5/7/2019 (McDonagh, Christina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century Indemnity Company v Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jack W. Pirozzolo
Represented By: Doreen M. Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Michael P. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?