Mathews, III v. Advised Assets Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Edward Christian Mathews, III
Defendant: Douglas J Heald and Advised Assets Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11057
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action Pending Resolution of a Prior Filed Arbitration, or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by Edward Christian Mathews, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mangones, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action Pending Resolution of a Prior Filed Arbitration, or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Montes, Mariliz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Assented-To). Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss is due by 6/28/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 28, 2019 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Edward Christian Mathews, III.(Mangones, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action Pending Resolution of a Prior Filed Arbitration, or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by Advised Assets Group, LLC, Douglas J Heald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pinarchick, Cheryl)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action Pending Resolution of a Prior Filed Arbitration, or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration by Advised Assets Group, LLC, Douglas J Heald.(Pinarchick, Cheryl)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Pinarchick, Cheryl)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 Reset Deadlines: Answer/response due by 6/7/2019. (Simeone, Maria)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss in light of the #8 Amended complaint. (Simeone, Maria)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward Christian Mathews, III. (Mangones, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edward Christian Mathews, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mangones, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Advised Assets Group, LLC, Douglas J Heald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Pinarchick, Cheryl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Advised Assets Group, LLC, Douglas J Heald.(Pinarchick, Cheryl)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advised Assets Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Co. for Advised Assets Group, LLC.. (Pinarchick, Cheryl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advised Assets Group, LLC, Douglas J Heald ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7671939 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Pinarchick, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews, III v. Advised Assets Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J Heald
Represented By: Cheryl B. Pinarchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advised Assets Group, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl B. Pinarchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Christian Mathews, III
Represented By: John A. Mangones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?