White v. Spaulding
Plaintiff: Clarence Johnel White
Defendant: Stephen Spaulding, E. Riley, Scott Murray, M.D., Michael Segal and Berhan Yeh, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11102
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and mailed to plaintiff with Local Rule 4.1 and forms and instructions for service by the USMS. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Service by USMS and Local Rule 4.1)(PSSA, 3)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at FMC Devens. [Mailed to plaintiff and treasurer on 7/17/2019.] (PSSA, 3)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall issue summonses as to all defendants and the plaintiff shall serve the summons, complaint, and this order upon the defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because the plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have the United States Marshals Service. The plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of the issuance of the summonses to complete service. All claims against defendants in their official capacity are dismissed. If the plaintiff seeks a preliminary injunction, he must file, and serve on the defendants, a separate motion for a preliminary injunction in which he identifies the preliminary relief he seeks. He must also file, and serve upon the defendants, a memorandum of law in support of the motion, together with any supporting affidavits or other evidence. [Order mailed to plaintiff and prison treasurer on 7/17/2019.] (PSSA, 3)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Intention to File a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order and Suit in the United states District Court in Massachusetts by Clarence Johnel White (Halley, Taylor)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Clarence Johnel White.(Halley, Taylor)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Stephen Spaulding, Michael Segal, Berhan Yeh, M.D., Scott Murray, M.D., E. Riley, filed by Clarence Johnel White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Halley, Taylor)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiffs request for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. If plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, within 35 days of the date of this order (that is, by July 5, 2019), he must (a) either pay the $350 filing fee and $50 administrative fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a six-month certified prison account statement and (b) file a complaint. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the action without prejudice. [Copy of order mailed to plaintiff on 5/31/2019 @ FMC Devens with Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.] (PSSA, 3)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Clarence Johnel White. (No complaint filed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Murray, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berhan Yeh, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Johnel White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?