Millbury Commons Investors LLC v. Route 146 Millbury LLC

Plaintiff: Millbury Commons Investors LLC
Defendant: Route 146 Millbury LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11124
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Counts (Joint) by Route 146 Millbury LLC. (Gardener, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Route 146 Millbury LLC. (Gardener, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 assented-To Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of its #11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Route 146 Millbury LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's [Proposed] Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Gardener, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Millbury Commons Investors LLC. (Curtin, Jason)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Preysman in Support re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Route 146 Millbury LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gardener, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Route 146 Millbury LLC. (Gardener, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Route 146 Millbury LLC.(Gardener, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Route 146 Millbury LLC identifying Other Affiliate R.K. Millbury LLC for Route 146 Millbury LLC.. (Gardener, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Route 146 Millbury LLC.(Gardener, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Kete on behalf of Route 146 Millbury LLC (Kete, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Gardener on behalf of Route 146 Millbury LLC (Gardener, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Route 146 Millbury LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Curtin, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Millbury Commons Investors LLC. (Pisegna, Vincent)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Millbury Commons Investors LLC. (Pisegna, Vincent) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/16/2019 to include Local Category Form) (DeMaria, Timothy).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Route 146 Millbury LLC. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7687474 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Millbury Commons Investors LLC. (Pisegna, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millbury Commons Investors LLC v. Route 146 Millbury LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Route 146 Millbury LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Gardener
Represented By: David J. Kete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millbury Commons Investors LLC
Represented By: Jason B. Curtin
Represented By: Vincent J. Pisegna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?