United States of America v. Kayem Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Kayem Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11126
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. Stipulation of Settlement and Order. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Leonard Wallace)(Frankel, Donald)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Frankel, Donald)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Kayem Foods, Inc..(Connors, Curtis)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis A. Connors on behalf of Kayem Foods, Inc. (Connors, Curtis)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #7 Waiver of Service Executed - Corrected Certificate of Service. (Frankel, Donald)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Kayem Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Frankel, Donald)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Frankel, Donald)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Settlement - Notice of Lodging of proposed Stipulation of Settlement and Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation of Settlement and Order) (Frankel, Donald)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kayem Foods, Inc. (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Sheet) (Frankel, Donald) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/16/2019) (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kayem Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayem Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis A. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Donald G. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?