RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC v. KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Plaintiff: RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Kallidus Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11139
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 45 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Scheduling Conference held on 6/27/2019: Automatic Discovery to be completed by 7/19/19; Amendments and/or Supplements to the Pleadings due by 8/9/2019; written discovery to be served by 10/31/19, answered by 11/30/19; fact depositions and fact Discovery to be completed by 2/29/2020; experts designated and Rule 26 Reports exchanged by 3/31/20, rebuttals (if any) by 4/30/20; expert depositions to be completed by 5/31/20; dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020, oppositions by 7/31/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Joint Status Report re: mediation due by 2/15/2020. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Rajwani, Berkowitz (by phone), Bernarducci, Cohn) (Lima, Christine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 44 Amended CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rajwani, Catherine)
June 25, 2019 Filing 43 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steven A. Berkowitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven A. Berkowitz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7749395 by RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rajwani, Catherine)
June 25, 2019 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC. (Rajwani, Catherine)
June 21, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to Counterclaim by RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC.(Rajwani, Catherine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Herling David Romero Adrianza on behalf of RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC (Romero Adrianza, Herling)
June 20, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rajwani, Catherine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine I. Rajwani on behalf of RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC (Rajwani, Catherine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Fidelity and Deposit Company. (Cohn, Joshua)
June 20, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Kallidus Technologies. (Cohn, Joshua)
June 20, 2019 Filing 34 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Cohn, Joshua)
May 31, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kallidus Technologies, Inc.. (Cohn, Joshua)
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss Corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., a Swiss Corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.. (Cohn, Joshua)
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC by Kallidus Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cohn, Joshua)
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.(Cohn, Joshua)
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Cohn on behalf of Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Kallidus Technologies, Inc. (Cohn, Joshua)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff D. Bernarducci on behalf of Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Kallidus Technologies, Inc. (Bernarducci, Jeff)
May 20, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
May 20, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:18-cv-09141.
May 13, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is hereby DENIED; Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED; this matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Vicinage. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 5/13/2019. (tf, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 23 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 5/13/2019. (tf, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHN, JOSHUA)
July 27, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA COHN on behalf of FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (COHN, JOSHUA)
July 18, 2018 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition filed by RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Douglas Cook, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service)(BERKOWITZ, STEVEN)
June 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (THOMPSON, DUVOL)
June 28, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Responses due by 7/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMPSON, DUVOL)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 6/26/2018. (tf, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND. FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND waiver sent on 6/5/2018, answer due 8/6/2018. (THOMPSON, DUVOL)
June 14, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #15 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2018. (tf, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Kallidus Technologies, Inc... (THOMPSON, DUVOL)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: By consent, the initial scheduling conference on 6/19/2018, and associated deadlines, shall be, and are hereby, adjourned pending resolution of the renewed motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/12/2018. (slc)
June 11, 2018 Filing 13 Letter from Steven Berkowitz re 12 Order,. (BERKOWITZ, STEVEN)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from counsel for Defendant [D.I. 11] requesting an adjournment of the 6/19/2018 initial scheduling conference, as well as the adjournment of the deadline for submission of the joint discovery plan. Counsel for Plaintiff shall advise the Court in writing as to whether Plaintiff consents to the request. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/11/2018. (slc)
June 7, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Duvol M. Thompson, re adjournment of June 19 conference and submission of a Joint Discovery Plan. (THOMPSON, DUVOL)
June 4, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED on Amended Complaint as to FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Taryn Franchetti* (tf, )
June 4, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC as to FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND. (BERKOWITZ, STEVEN)
June 4, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Division (BERKOWITZ, STEVEN)
May 31, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, filed by RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BERKOWITZ, STEVEN)
May 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Division . Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
May 18, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Division (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, DUVOL)
May 18, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Division (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Subcontract, #2 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, DUVOL)
May 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss ( Responses due by 6/4/2018), MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Boston Division by KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, DUVOL)
May 11, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jbk, )
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 6/19/2018 10:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/11/18. (jbk, )
May 11, 2018 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (THOMPSON, DUVOL)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey Burlington County, case number BUR-L-852-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8734928), filed by KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Proceedings, #2 Exhibit 2: Declration of Duvol M. Thompson In Support, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, DUVOL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC v. KALLIDUS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIVER FRONT RECYCLING & AGGREGATE, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN ALAN BERKOWITZ
Represented By: Catherine I. Rajwani
Represented By: Herling David Romero Adrianza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: DUVOL M. THOMPSON
Represented By: Joshua Cohn
Represented By: Jeff D. Bernarducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kallidus Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: DUVOL M. THOMPSON
Represented By: Joshua Cohn
Represented By: Jeff D. Bernarducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?