In Re. Gianasmidis et al
Appellant: The Law Offices of Russo & Minchoff, Stephen J. Kuzma and India L. Minchoff
Trustee: Carolyn Bankowski-13-12 and John Fitzgerald
In Re: Savvas V Gianasmidis
Case Number: 1:2019cv11143
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 5, 2019 to File Appellee's Brief by Savvas V Gianasmidis.(Nader, George)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/5/2019 to TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE BRIEF. (Paine, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/5/2019 to TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE BRIEF by India L. Minchoff.(Minchoff, India)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 7/2/2019. Appellee Brief due by 7/16/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/30/2019. (Paine, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Record - Part 2, #2 Transmittal, #3 Transmittal - Part 2)(Paine, Matthew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-12119. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Gianasmidis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Law Offices of Russo & Minchoff
Represented By: India L. Minchoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen J. Kuzma
Represented By: Stephen J. Kuzma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: India L. Minchoff
Represented By: India L. Minchoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Carolyn Bankowski-13-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Represented By: Paula R.C. Bachtell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Savvas V Gianasmidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?