Wiley v. Boulay Law Firm, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rachel Wiley
Defendant: Boulay Law Firm, LLC and Jeanne D'Arc Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2019cv11159
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference reset for 8/20/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jeanne D'Arc Credit Union.(Connelly, Frederick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference reset for 8/15/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by Rachel Wiley.(Brine, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Jeanne D'Arc Credit Union answer due 7/10/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint by Jeanne D'Arc Credit Union.(Connelly, Frederick)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick E. Connelly, Jr on behalf of Jeanne D'Arc Credit Union (Connelly, Frederick)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant, Boulay Law Firm's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Boulay Law Firm, LLC.(Greene, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Greene on behalf of Boulay Law Firm, LLC (Greene, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark William Shaughnessy on behalf of Boulay Law Firm, LLC (Shaughnessy, Mark)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeanne D'Arc Credit Union served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Brine, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boulay Law Firm, LLC served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Brine, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7697924 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rachel Wiley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Brine, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Boulay Law Firm, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulay Law Firm, LLC
Represented By: Matthew H. Greene
Represented By: Mark William Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne D'Arc Credit Union
Represented By: Frederick E. Connelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Wiley
Represented By: Christopher M. Brine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?