Bean v. Johnson & Wales University
Plaintiff: Loretta Bean
Defendant: Johnson & Wales University
Case Number: 1:2019cv11197
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janice Taylor)(Walker, Kacey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #12 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Janice Taylor)(Walker, Kacey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Loretta Bean. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Loretta Bean)(Welsh, Richard)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Emily Gilcreast)(Walker, Kacey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Welsh, Jr on behalf of Loretta Bean (Welsh, Richard)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of Johnson & Wales University (Richard, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kacey Houston Walker on behalf of Johnson & Wales University (Walker, Kacey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Wales University. (Walker, Kacey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Wales University ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7705350 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walker, Kacey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Kacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bean v. Johnson & Wales University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Bean
Represented By: Christopher W. Kita
Represented By: Richard M. Welsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Wales University
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Represented By: Kacey Houston Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?