Pebble Tide LLC v. Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pebble Tide LLC
Defendant: Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11212
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc. answer/response due 8/1/2019. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 1st, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Defendant Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc. by Pebble Tide LLC.(Chico-Barris, Gustavo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pebble Tide LLC. Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Chico-Barris, Gustavo)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7709272 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent No. 10,303,411, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Chart for US Patent No. 10,303,411, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons as to Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.)(Chico-Barris, Gustavo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pebble Tide LLC v. Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pebble Tide LLC
Represented By: Gustavo A. Chico-Barris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?