Doe et al v. Cowan et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Doe and Macy Doe
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark Koumans, Robert M. Cowan and United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv11269
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane T. Haviland on behalf of Macy Doe, Thomas Doe (Haviland, Jane)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Herndon on behalf of Macy Doe, Thomas Doe (Herndon, Courtney)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kanstroom Musgrave on behalf of Macy Doe, Thomas Doe (Musgrave, Emily)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Bono, Christine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously; granting #13 Motion for Protective Order. (Bono, Christine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Badger, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT & Proposed Briefing Schedule by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe. (Badger, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Robert M. Cowan, Department of Homeland Security, Mark Koumans, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (Kanwit, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Badger on behalf of Macy Doe, Thomas Doe (Badger, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe. (Finegan, Susan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe.(Finegan, Susan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously filed by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe. (Finegan, Susan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe.(Finegan, Susan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint,, (Declaration of Ellen VanScoyoc) by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Finegan, Susan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Equitable Relief against United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Mark Koumans, Robert M. Cowan, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7721134 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Macy Doe, Thomas Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Category Form)(Finegan, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Cowan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Cowan
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Doe
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Emily Kanstroom Musgrave
Represented By: Courtney Herndon
Represented By: Jane T. Haviland
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Badger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macy Doe
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Emily Kanstroom Musgrave
Represented By: Courtney Herndon
Represented By: Jane T. Haviland
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Badger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?