Garity v. Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laila Thompson and Edward Garity
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Guy Macdonald, Jacques Dumas, Piper Jaffray & Co. and H.C. Wainwright & Co., LLC
Petitioner: Peng Zhao and Tian Tian
Case Number: 1:2019cv11282
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 60 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 6, 2019 Filing 59 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Having granted the motion to appoint counsel and having appointed Laila Thompson as Lead Plaintiff on August 2, 2019, the court now adopts the previously submitted proposed order regarding briefing schedule. An amended complaint shall be filed no later than October 1, 2019. Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within sixty days of the filing of the amended complaint. Prior to filing any motion to dismiss, counsel shall confer and attempt in good faith to resolve or narrow the issue, as required by Local Rule 7.1(a)(2). If Defendants move to dismiss the amended complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file a response within 60 days of the filing of the motion to the dismiss. No reply may be filed absent leave court. See Local Rule 7.1(b)(3). The court anticipates that the lengthy briefing period will allow counsel adequate time to conform their memoranda to 20 pages each. (Kinsella, Devan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 58 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Appoint Laila Thompson as Lead Plaintiff #42 . (Kinsella, Devan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by Laila Thompson re #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Laila Thompson as Lead Plaintiff [Notice of Non-Opposition] (Wolke, Kara)
July 31, 2019 Filing 56 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Michael Rowe. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Rowe Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7807289 by Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Rowe)(Manson, Robert)
July 29, 2019 Filing 54 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Thomas P. Swigert. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 53 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Jennifer M. Leinbach. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas Swigert Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7802471 by Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Swigert)(Manson, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Manson on behalf of SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. (Manson, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Manson on behalf of Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated (Manson, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Manson on behalf of H.C. Wainwright & Co., LLC (Manson, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Manson on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp. (Manson, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Manson on behalf of Piper Jaffray & Co. (Manson, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 46 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer M. Leinbach Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7800725 by Edward Garity, Laila Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Andrews, Daryl)
July 23, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Laila Thompson as Lead Plaintiff (on behalf of all Defendants) filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Kolovos, Peter)
July 15, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION re #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Laila Thompson as Lead Plaintiff by Laila Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Glancy Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Andrews DeValerio Firm Resume)(Wolke, Kara)
July 15, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support re #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Laila Thompson as Lead Plaintiff filed by Laila Thompson. (Wolke, Kara)
July 15, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Laila Thompson as Lead Plaintiff by Laila Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolke, Kara)
July 12, 2019 Filing 41 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing in part and denying in part Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule #40 . The July 15, 2019, scheduling conference is cancelled, and the associated deadlines are vacated, but the further requested relief is denied. On May 30, 2019, Judge Carter of the Southern District of New York issued an Order, ECF No. 26, denying without prejudice Laila Thompson's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of lead counsel, ECF No. 8. Accordingly, there are no pending motions. If Laila Thompson seeks appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of lead counsel, she shall promptly renew her motion. Judge Carter's prior Order, ECF No. 25, regarding Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint, and requirement that counsel submit a proposed schedule for filing an amended complaint and Defendants' response thereto once a Lead Plaintiff is selected and Lead Counsel appointed, remains in effect. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 8, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Setting Briefing Schedule by Laila Thompson. (Wolke, Kara)
June 27, 2019 Filing 39 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Kara M. Wolke. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Garth A. Spencer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kara M. Wolke Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7753385 by Edward Garity, Laila Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Andrews, Daryl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Garth A. Spencer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7753384 by Edward Garity, Laila Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Andrews, Daryl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 35 Copy re 34 Notice regarding mandatory use of ECF, #33 Notice of Scheduling Conference, mailed to Lesley Portnoy Pomerantz Grossman Hufford Dahlstrom & Gross LLP 600 Third Avenue New York, NY 10016 (MacDonald, Gail)
June 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE issued to Attorney Lesley Portnoy regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen DeValerio on behalf of Edward Garity, Laila Thompson (DeValerio, Glen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Willey on behalf of Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Willey, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Kolovos on behalf of Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Kolovos, Peter)
June 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl DeValerio Andrews on behalf of Edward Garity, Laila Thompson (Andrews, Daryl)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06797.
May 30, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Massachusetts. (anc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION & ORDER re: #16 MOTION to Transfer Case . filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #21 MOTION to Appoint Laila Thompson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) filed by Laila Thompson. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to transfer is GRANTED and Laila Thompson's motion to appoint lead plaintiff is DENIED without prejudice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/30/2019) (anc) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. Modified on 6/3/2019 (anc).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; and, 2. Following entry of an order by the Court pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 ("PSLRA") selecting a Lead Plaintiff(s) and appointing Lead Counsel, counsel for Defendants and Lead Counsel shall confer and submit a proposed schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and Defendants' response thereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/13/2018) (jca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 24 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bongiorno, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bongiorno, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Edward Garity, Laila Thompson. (Portnoy, Lesley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Laila Thompson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Laila Thompson.(Portnoy, Lesley)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Paul A. Engelmayer is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. MOTION to Appoint Laila Thompson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #11 MOTION to Appoint Tian Tian and Peng Zhao to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bongiorno, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Michael G. Bongiorno dated October 9, 2018. Document filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Bongiorno, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Maria D. Stahl in Support re: #16 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bongiorno, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bongiorno, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald, Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Bongiorno, Michael)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION OF TIAN TIAN AND PENG ZHAO FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Tian Tian and Peng Zhao to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Tian Tian, Peng Zhao. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court has received two competing motions for appointment of lead plaintiffs and lead counsel. See Dkts. 8, 11. Any responsive filings shall be due October 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 10/9/2018) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/26/2018) (rjm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of J. Alexander Hood II in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Tian Tian and Peng Zhao to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Tian Tian, Peng Zhao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Hood, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Tian Tian and Peng Zhao to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Tian Tian, Peng Zhao. (Hood, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Tian Tian and Peng Zhao to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Counsel . Document filed by Tian Tian, Peng Zhao. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hood, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. MOTION to Appoint Laila Thompson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Laila Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Portnoy, Lesley)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. MOTION to Appoint Laila Thompson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Laila Thompson. (Portnoy, Lesley)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP., MOTION to Appoint Laila Thompson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Laila Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Jacques Dumas, Guy Macdonald. (Bongiorno, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Bongiorno, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bongiorno, Michael)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BMO Capital Markets Corp., Jacques Dumas, H.C. Wainwright & Co., LLC, Guy Macdonald, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (pc)
July 30, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 30, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 30, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edward Garity. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Guy Macdonald, Jacques Dumas, Piper Jaffray & Co., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Suntrust Robinson Humphrey & Co., LLC, H.C. Wainwright & Co., LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edward Garity. (Portnoy, Lesley)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., Jacques Dumas, H.C. Wainwright & Co., LLC, Guy Macdonald, Piper Jaffray & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15379835)Document filed by Edward Garity.(Portnoy, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garity v. Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peng Zhao
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tian Tian
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas P. Swigert
Represented By: Michael Rowe
Represented By: Robert G. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Swigert
Represented By: Michael Rowe
Represented By: Robert G. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetraphase Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Daniel Willey
Represented By: Peter J. Kolovos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Thomas P. Swigert
Represented By: Michael Rowe
Represented By: Robert G. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Macdonald
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Daniel Willey
Represented By: Peter J. Kolovos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacques Dumas
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Daniel Willey
Represented By: Peter J. Kolovos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Thomas P. Swigert
Represented By: Michael Rowe
Represented By: Robert G. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.C. Wainwright & Co., LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Swigert
Represented By: Michael Rowe
Represented By: Robert G. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laila Thompson
Represented By: Lesley Portnoy
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Represented By: Kara M Wolke
Represented By: Garth A. Spencer
Represented By: Jennifer M. Leinbach
Represented By: Kara Wolke
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Garity
Represented By: Lesley Portnoy
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Represented By: Garth A. Spencer
Represented By: Jennifer M. Leinbach
Represented By: Kara Wolke
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?