Jacq et al v. Baran et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Sacha Jacq
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran, USCIS, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli, DHS (Department of Homeland Security) and Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv11341
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 General Order 19-02 dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Kinsella, Devan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Kathy A. Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, DHS (Department of Homeland Security), Kevin McAleenan, USCIS (Sady, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacha Jacq. Kevin McAleenan served June 20, 2019. Answer due August 20, 2019. (Bless, Jesse)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacha Jacq. Kathy A. Baran served June 20, 2019. Answer due August 20, 2019. (Bless, Jesse)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacha Jacq. DHS (Department of Homeland Security) served June 20, 2019. Answer due August 20, 2019. (Bless, Jesse)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacha Jacq. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on June 20, 2019. Answer due August 20, 2019. (Bless, Jesse)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacha Jacq. USCIS served on June 18, 2019. Answer due August 16, 2019. (Bless, Jesse)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sacha Jacq. William Barr served on June 18, 2019. Answer due August 16, 2019. (Bless, Jesse)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Sacha Jacq. Andrew E Lelling served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Bless, Jesse)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M. Bless on behalf of Sacha Jacq (Bless, Jesse)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT SUBMITTED against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7735457 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sacha Jacq. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Supplement category sheet, #3 Supplement summons, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(Bless, Jesse) Modified on 6/17/2019 to restrict exhibit due minors' information (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacq et al v. Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS (Department of Homeland Security)
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Sacha Jacq
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?