Kaur et al v. World Business Lenders, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ramanjeet Kaur, Kulwinder Singh Uppal and New England Distributors, Inc.
Defendant: World Business Lenders, LLC, Axos Bank, WBO SPL I, LLC and Atlantis Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11364
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Axos Bank, WBO SPL I, LLC, World Business Lenders, LLC. (Dinardo, Patrick)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Axos Bank, WBO SPL I, LLC, World Business Lenders, LLC.(Dinardo, Patrick)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 16, 2019 to Respond to Complaint. (Paine, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 16, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Axos Bank, WBO SPL I, LLC, World Business Lenders, LLC.(Todd, Erika) (Modified on 7/25/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Axos Bank answer due 7/26/2019; WBO SPL I, LLC answer due 7/26/2019; World Business Lenders, LLC answer due 7/26/2019. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (Dinardo, Patrick)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 26, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Axos Bank, WBO SPL I, LLC, World Business Lenders, LLC.(Todd, Erika)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick P. Dinardo on behalf of Axos Bank, WBO SPL I, LLC, World Business Lenders, LLC (Dinardo, Patrick)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Axos Bank, WBO SPL I, LLC, World Business Lenders, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7740517 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint with cover sheet), #2 Exhibit B (Three State court summonses with Returns of Service), #3 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Todd, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaur et al v. World Business Lenders, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramanjeet Kaur
Represented By: Rachel J. Eisenhaure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulwinder Singh Uppal
Represented By: Rachel J. Eisenhaure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel J. Eisenhaure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Business Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Patrick P. Dinardo
Represented By: Erika L. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axos Bank
Represented By: Patrick P. Dinardo
Represented By: Erika L. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WBO SPL I, LLC
Represented By: Patrick P. Dinardo
Represented By: Erika L. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantis Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?