Despres v. Citizens Disability, LLC
Plaintiff: Rick Despres
Defendant: Citizens Disability, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11367
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 4, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Paine, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 4, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Citizens Disability, LLC.(Lieberman, Troy) (Modified on 8/14/2019 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 14, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Answer or Response due August 14, 2019. (Paine, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 14, 2019 to File Answer by Rick Despres.(Campbell, Jason)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Avi R. Kaufman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Avi R. Kaufman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7767276 by Rick Despres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Campbell, Jason)
July 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Rick Despres. Citizens Disability, LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Rick Despres. (Campbell, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizens Disability, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7742132 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rick Despres. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Campbell, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Despres v. Citizens Disability, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Despres
Represented By: Jason R. Campbell
Represented By: Avi R. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Disability, LLC
Represented By: Troy K. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?