MacNeil et al v. AM General LLC

Plaintiff: Ronald MacNeil
Defendant: AM General LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11386
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Response to Defendant AM General LLC's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Oral Argument by Ronald MacNeil.(McMorris, Leah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #16 Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand and Request for Oral Argument filed by AM General LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pavlick Order, #2 Exhibit B - MacNeil Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Dismissal of AMG, #5 Exhibit E - MacNeil Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Camblin, #7 Exhibit G - Operators Manual 2.5 Ton, #8 Exhibit H - Repair Parts Manual, #9 Exhibit I - Military Specs 2.5 Ton, #10 Exhibit J - Military Specs 5 Ton)(Hartnett, Patricia)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand and Request for Oral Argument by Ronald MacNeil. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(McMorris, Leah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant AM General LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AM General LLC.(Hartnett, Patricia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record AM General LLC summons served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(Vieira, Leonardo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by AM General LLC of Asbestos Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Case Management Order)(Hartnett, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam A. DeSipio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nancy Shane Rappaport. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam A. DeSipio Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7757952 by AM General LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Adam A. DeSipio)(Hartnett, Patricia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nancy Shane Rappaport Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7757947 by AM General LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Nancy Shane Rappaport)(Hartnett, Patricia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AM General LLC. (Hartnett, Patricia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Hartnett on behalf of AM General LLC (Hartnett, Patricia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal,, by AM General LLC. (Hartnett, Patricia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AM General LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7747144 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Tracking Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Disclosure Form, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Answers to Revised Standard Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Revised Standard Requests for Documents, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Requests for Documents to Defendant, #7 Exhibit Notice of Taking Deposition - M.C.R.P. 30(b)(6), #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Hartnett, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacNeil et al v. AM General LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald MacNeil
Represented By: Andrew S. Wainwright
Represented By: Leah M. McMorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM General LLC
Represented By: Patricia A. Hartnett
Represented By: Adam A DeSipio
Represented By: Nancy Shane Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?