Cruz v. Raytheon Company et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Cruz
Defendant: Raytheon Company, John/Jane Does 1-10 and Kelly B. Lappin
Case Number: 1:2019cv11425
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint, as to Kelly B. Lappin answer due 9/9/2019; Raytheon Company answer due 9/9/2019. (Lara, Miguel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raytheon Company. (Fleckner, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kline Moore on behalf of Kelly B. Lappin, Raytheon Company (Moore, Kline)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 9, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond and Establishing a Briefing Schedule by Kelly B. Lappin, Raytheon Company.(Fleckner, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Fleckner on behalf of Kelly B. Lappin, Raytheon Company (Fleckner, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kelly B. Lappin served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Needham, Douglas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Raytheon Company served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Needham, Douglas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John/Jane Does 1-10, Kelly B. Lappin, Raytheon Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John/Jane Does 1-10, Kelly B. Lappin, Raytheon Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7755517 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Johnny Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Needham, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Raytheon Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Represented By: Kline Moore
Represented By: James O. Fleckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly B. Lappin
Represented By: Kline Moore
Represented By: James O. Fleckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Cruz
Represented By: Douglas P. Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?