Fuller v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Joseph N Fuller
Respondent: Todd Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility and US Attorney General William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv11435
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Mail sent to Joseph N. Fuller re. 10 #11 : Mail returned as undeliverable. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. CLOSING ORDER DISMISSING CASE. ( A copy of this Order has been mailed to the Petitioner.)(Montes, Mariliz)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the declaration reflecting that the petitioner has been released from immigration custody, Doc. No. 9-1, the respondent's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 8), to which the petitioner has not responded, is ALLOWED. The habeas petition (Doc. No. 1) is DISMISSED as MOOT. (A copy of this Order has been mailed to the Petitioner via first class mail.) (Montes, Mariliz)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Warden of Immigration Detention Facility. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Johnson, Anita)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Warden of Immigration Detention Facility.(Johnson, Anita)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of William Barr, Todd Lyons, Kevin McAleenan, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility (Johnson, Anita)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5)
June 30, 2019 Filing 4 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (PSSA 5)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST075127 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019. Stand Procedural Order Re: Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 5.2(C) (Danieli, Chris) Modified on 07/02/2019 to correct the docket text of the entry (Danieli, Chris).
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Joseph N Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph N Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?