Nuance Communications Inc. v. Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Nuance Communications Inc.
Defendant: Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11438
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of / Declaration of Tasos Michael in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.. (Adam, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of / Declaration of Agathi Nicolaou in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.. (Adam, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of / Declaration of Ioannis Nikolaidis in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Adam, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of / Declaration of Dimitris Vassos in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.. (Adam, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.. (Adam, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss by Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd..(Adam, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Adam on behalf of Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd. (Adam, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd. served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Itzkoff, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carrie Richey Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7821178 by Nuance Communications Inc..(Itzkoff, Jennifer)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added David Greenbaum. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Putnam, Harold)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Greenbaum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7776151 by Nuance Communications Inc..(Itzkoff, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 and Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Boaz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7763076 by Nuance Communications Inc..(Itzkoff, Jennifer)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christine Dupriest Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7763065 by Nuance Communications Inc..(Itzkoff, Jennifer)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christian E. Mammen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7762970 by Nuance Communications Inc..(Itzkoff, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
July 1, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 06/28/2019, receipt number 0101-7757440. (Tran, Henry)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Itzkoff, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nuance Communications Inc.. (Itzkoff, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7757654 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nuance Communications Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Supplement Category Form)(Itzkoff, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuance Communications Inc. v. Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omilia Natural Language Solutions, Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin C. Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuance Communications Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Itzkoff
Represented By: Christine Dupriest
Represented By: David Greenbaum
Represented By: Christian E. Mammen
Represented By: Carrie Richey
Represented By: David R. Boaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?