Sampedro et al v. California Nightclub, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ursula Sanchez, Ursula Mayes, Joanna Krupa, Claudia Sampedro, Tiffany Toth and Lucy Pinder
Defendant: California Nightclub, Inc. and Yoel Herrera
Case Number: 1:2019cv11446
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John V. Golaszewski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John V. Golaszewski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7852498 by Joanna Krupa, Lucy Pinder, Claudia Sampedro, Ursula Sanchez, Tiffany Toth. (Attachments: #1 Attorney certification, #2 proposed order)(Sullivan, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 8/20/2019,to correct time (MacDonald, Gail).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Yoel Herrera served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Sullivan, Paul)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed California Nightclub, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Sullivan, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7759267 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joanna Krupa, Lucy Pinder, Claudia Sampedro, Ursula Sanchez, Tiffany Toth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Local category form)(Sullivan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampedro et al v. California Nightclub, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Sanchez
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Krupa
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Nightclub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoel Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?