Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC v. Kirkland et al
Plaintiff: Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC
Defendant: Interscope Records, Inc. and Jonathan Kirkland
Case Number: 1:2019cv11469
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jonathan Kirkland served on 8/17/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Brown, Christopher)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC. (Brown, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC. (Brown, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7765753 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC v. Kirkland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interscope Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?