De Jesus v. Charles et al
Petitioner: Angela De Jesus
Respondent: Marcos Charles, Bruce E. Chadbourne, Kevin McAleenan, Steve J. Souza, Michael McCleary and Dennis Riordan
Case Number: 1:2019cv11476
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 7)(Paine, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Steve J. Souza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Piemonte, Eve)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Steve J. Souza.(Piemonte, Eve)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 28, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (Paine, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 28, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Steve J. Souza.(Piemonte, Eve)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Steve J. Souza (Piemonte, Eve)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST075705 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. (PSSA 5)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Castilla, Francis)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Castilla, Francis)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Angela De Jesus.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus v. Charles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marcos Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bruce E. Chadbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve J. Souza
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angela De Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?