Faith, et al. v. Bank of America, N.A., et al.
Plaintiff: Peter Faith, Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith and Michele Faith
Defendant: Fay Servicing, L.L.C., US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association, City of New Bedford, Massachusetts, Bank of America, N.A. and Silva Realty Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11477
Filed: July 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 40 Opposition re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C.. (Manganaro, Kevin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Silva Realty Group, Inc..(O'Grady, Benjamin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Silva Realty Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Grady, Benjamin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Entry of Default by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Faiths' Counsel)(Flores, Marylyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Fay Servicing, L.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association, US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Kingston, Christine)
August 22, 2019 Filing 35 Opposition re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Flores, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 34 Opposition re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Michele Faith, #2 Exhibit Emails of Silva Realty Group, #3 Exhibit Faith Utility Bills, #4 Exhibit Silva Realty Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Emails of Shanon Shreve's and Letter to AG)(Flores, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 33 Joint Opposition re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (McCann, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 32 Opposition re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Foreclose, #2 Exhibit Letters of Debt, #3 Exhibit Mortgage Assignments, #4 Exhibit Utility, #5 Exhibit Faiths Qualified Written Request, #6 Exhibit Check from Ocwen to Michele Faith)(Flores, Marylyn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 31 Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Foreclose, #2 Exhibit Letters of Debt balance, #3 Exhibit Assignments, #4 Exhibit Utility Bills, #5 Exhibit Truman Capital Assignment of Property services, #6 Exhibit E-mail between Silva Realty et. al., #7 Exhibit Silva Realty Group Responses to Interrogatories propounded by Faiths, #8 Exhibit Affidavits of BANA employees, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Michele Faith)(Flores, Marylyn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without Prejudice or, in the alternative, to stay the case pending the resolution of a prior related case, #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of New Bedford, Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FC Deed, #2 Exhibit Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Inspection of Entry Warrant)(Ecker, Deborah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of New Bedford, Massachusetts.(Ecker, Deborah)
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without Prejudice or, in the alternative, to stay the case pending the resolution of a prior related case filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript, #2 Exhibit Truman Capital Assignment of property Services to Silva Realty Group, #3 Exhibit E-mails between Silva Realty and truman capital advisors, #4 Exhibit Silva Realty Groups Response to Interrogatories propounded on them by Faiths, #5 Exhibit Transcripts from Southeast Housing Court Hearing, #6 Exhibit Non-party Truman Capitals' Motion to Implead, #7 Exhibit Copy of Thompson Case)(Flores, Marylyn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 Opposition re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by U.S. Bank National Association, US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kingston, Christine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Third Party Counterclaims)(Manganaro, Kevin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C..(Manganaro, Kevin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura K. McKelvey on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C. (McKelvey, Maura)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Manganaro on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C. (Manganaro, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without Prejudice or, in the alternative, to stay the case pending the resolution of a prior related case filed by Fay Servicing, L.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association, US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Kingston, Christine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without Prejudice or, in the alternative, to stay the case pending the resolution of a prior related case by Fay Servicing, L.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association, US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust.(Kingston, Christine)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(McCann, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by City of New Bedford, Massachusetts.(Ecker, Deborah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah I. Ecker on behalf of City of New Bedford, Massachusetts (Ecker, Deborah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith.(Flores, Marylyn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Silva Realty Group, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fay Servicing, L.L.C. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of New Bedford, Massachusetts served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bank of America, N.A. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Bank National Association served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Service of Process filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. Individual(s)/Entities served: Ocwen Loan Servicing. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Service of Process filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. Individual(s)/Entities served: Bank of America, N.A.. (Flores, Marylyn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Polansky on behalf of Fay Servicing, L.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association, US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust (Polansky, Kevin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Kingston on behalf of Fay Servicing, L.L.C., U.S. Bank National Association, US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust (Kingston, Christine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, City of New Bedford, Massachusetts, U.S. Bank National Association, Fay Servicing, L.L.C., Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C., Silva Realty Group, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7767270 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jacqueline Faith, Michael Faith, Michele Faith, Peter Faith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flores, Marylyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019 since not initially included by counsel: #2 JS45 Local Category Form) (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faith, et al. v. Bank of America, N.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Asssociation as Legal Title, for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Maura K. McKelvey
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Bedford, Massachusetts
Represented By: Deborah I. Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: John H. McCann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva Realty Group, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin W. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Faith
Represented By: David S. Flores
Represented By: Marylyn E. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Faith
Represented By: David S. Flores
Represented By: Marylyn E. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Faith
Represented By: David S. Flores
Represented By: Marylyn E. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Faith
Represented By: David S. Flores
Represented By: Marylyn E. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?