Allied World Insurance Company v. MFR Developing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Insurance Company
Defendant: Michelle Henebury, MFR Developing LLC, Michael F. Rose Jr. and James M. Henebury
Case Number: 1:2019cv11490
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extend Time to File Answer by Michelle Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extend Time to File Answer by James M. Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S. Levin on behalf of Michelle Henebury (Levin, Carl)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by James M. Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S. Levin on behalf of James M. Henebury (Levin, Carl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World Insurance Company. (Riley, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael F. Rose Jr. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Riley, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed MFR Developing LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Riley, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michelle Henebury served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Riley, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed James M. Henebury served on 7/16/2009, answer due 8/6/2009. (Riley, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7769533 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Allied World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Riley, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Insurance Company v. MFR Developing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Henebury
Represented By: Carl S. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFR Developing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Rose Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Henebury
Represented By: Carl S. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?