Pruco Life Insurance Company v. Wallens et al
Plaintiff: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Benjamin J. Wallens and Jeffrey A. Nazarian
Case Number: 1:2019cv11492
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pruco Life Insurance Company. Benjamin J. Wallens waiver sent on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Maselek, Robert)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. Counsel for the plaintiff is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference.(Putnam, Harold)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey A. Nazarian.(Burnett, Joshua)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pruco Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Pruco Life Insurance Company.. (Maselek, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey A. Nazarian, Benjamin J. Wallens Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7770305 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Form)(Maselek, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruco Life Insurance Company v. Wallens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin J. Wallens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Nazarian
Represented By: Joshua A. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Maselek, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?