Stratton v. Bentley University
Plaintiff: Lupe Stratton
Defendant: Bentley University
Case Number: 1:2019cv11499
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bentley University. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. The Clerk issued a Notice to Plaintiff with instructions for service by the United States Marshals Service and a copy of Local Rule 4.1. Counsel may download USM-285 forms from the United States Marshals Website process< and may contact Clerk if hard copies of USM 285 forms are needed. (Attachments: #1 notice to plaintiff and LR 4.1)(PSSA, 4) (Entered: 0812/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons for service of the defendant. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshal Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, complaint and this order upon defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the issuance of summons to complete service. (PSSA, 4)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lupe Stratton.(Castilla, Francis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Entry #3, the summons should not have been issued, the plaintiff did not pay the filing fee. Counsel will be filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Please disregard entry #3. (Jones, Sherry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bentley University. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bentley University (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Lupe Stratton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Redacted Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Browne, Constance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stratton v. Bentley University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentley University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Stratton
Represented By: Constance A. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?