Parzenn Partners LLC et al v. Baran et al
Plaintiff: Parzenn Partners LLC
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv11515
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Kathy A. Baran, William P. Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Andrew E Lelling, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Johnson, Anita)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Kathy A. Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Farquhar, Rayford)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parzenn Partners LLC. (Bless, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parzenn Partners LLC. (Bless, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parzenn Partners LLC. (Bless, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parzenn Partners LLC. (Bless, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parzenn Partners LLC. (Bless, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parzenn Partners LLC. (Bless, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Parzenn Partners LLC. Andrew E Lelling served on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Bless, Jesse)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M. Bless on behalf of Parzenn Partners LLC (Bless, Jesse)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under Administrative Procedure Act against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7775038 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Parzenn Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 category form, #3 summons, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)(Bless, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parzenn Partners LLC et al v. Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parzenn Partners LLC
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?