Lin v. TipRanks, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Ching-Yi Lin
Defendant: TipRanks, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11517
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction submitted by Uri Gruenbaum by TipRanks, Ltd.. (Bigelow, Brandon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TipRanks, Ltd.. (Bigelow, Brandon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TipRanks, Ltd..(Bigelow, Brandon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Motion, #4 Notice of Removal)(McDonagh, Christina)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/16/19 to to file answer to Complaint and for Plaintiff to oppose any responsive motion to 09/16/19 (McDonagh, Christina)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/16/19 to to file answer to Complaint and for Plaintiff to oppose any responsive motion to 09/16/19 by TipRanks, Ltd..(Walz, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon L. Bigelow on behalf of TipRanks, Ltd. (Bigelow, Brandon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TipRanks, Ltd.. (Walz, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Walz on behalf of TipRanks, Ltd. (Walz, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TipRanks, Ltd. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7775451 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Civil Action Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint, and other materials, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Category Sheet)(Walz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin v. TipRanks, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ching-Yi Lin
Represented By: Jonas A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TipRanks, Ltd.
Represented By: Eric J. Walz
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?