Terry v. Vinfen Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard L. Terry
Defendant: Dan W. Gray and Vinfen Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Judith Gail Dein
Case Number: 1:2019cv11542
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING ADR CONFERENCE: By agreement, mediation before Magistrate Judge Dein set for Thursday, October 10, 2019, at 10:00AM in Courtroom #15 on the 5th Floor. Counsel are directed to be present with their clients or representatives thereof with full settlement authority. No later than three business days before the conference, each party shall submit (by mail or hand delivery addressed to Judge Dein, or by email to Jolyne_Dambrosio@mad.uscourts.gov) a brief memorandum marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" addressing the party's position on the merits of the case and on settlement. If you use a standard form settlement agreement, please bring a copy with you. If you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, please notify opposing counsel and the court as soon as possible. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Judith Gail Dein appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Certified State Court Record)(Lederman, Danielle)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge Dein for Alternative Dispute Resolution entered.(Simeone, Maria)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The motion to stay and request to be referred to mediation before Judge Dein is allowed. re #7 Motion to Stay (Simeone, Maria)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Request Referral to Magistrate Judge Dein for Mediation by Dan W. Gray, Vinfen Corporation.(Lederman, Danielle)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Lara, Miguel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn L. Kugell on behalf of Dan W. Gray, Vinfen Corporation (Kugell, Jaclyn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Jurema Lederman on behalf of Dan W. Gray, Vinfen Corporation (Lederman, Danielle)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vinfen Corporation. (Lederman, Danielle)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dan W. Gray, Vinfen Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7779945 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Lederman, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Vinfen Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan W. Gray
Represented By: Jaclyn L. Kugell
Represented By: Danielle Jurema Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinfen Corporation
Represented By: Jaclyn L. Kugell
Represented By: Danielle Jurema Lederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judith Gail Dein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?