McGinn v. Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Colonel James McGinn
Defendant: Secretary Matthew A. Beaton, in his Official and Individual Capacity, Massachusetts Environmental Police and Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs
Case Number: 1:2019cv11551
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Consented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' responsive pleading is due 9/30/19. (DLC, law3)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/30/2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Secretary Matthew A. Beaton, in his Official and Individual Capacity, Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs, Massachusetts Environmental Police.(Radigan, Douglas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Radigan on behalf of Secretary Matthew A. Beaton, in his Official and Individual Capacity (Radigan, Douglas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Service of Process filed by Colonel James McGinn. Individual(s)/Entities served: Office of the Attorney General for the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs. (Burke, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Burke, Timothy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Service of Process filed by Colonel James McGinn. Individual(s)/Entities served: Office of the Attorney General for the Massachusetts Environmental Police. (Burke, Timothy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massachusetts Environmental Police served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Burke, Timothy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Secretary Matthew A. Beaton, in his Official and Individual Capacity served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Burke, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7782757 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Colonel James McGinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Category Form)(Burke, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinn v. Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Matthew A. Beaton, in his Official and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Douglas T. Radigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Environmental Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonel James McGinn
Represented By: Timothy M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?