Colon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Iran Colon
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill, Social Security Administration and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv11553
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iran Colon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons - ORCC, #2 Exhibit Summons - AG, #3 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Valentine, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Iran Colon. Andrew Saul served on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons - USA, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Valentine, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Local Rule 4.1 and instructions for service by the United States Marshals Service attached. USM 285 form may be found at www.usmarshals.gov/process/usm285.pdf and is also available from the Clerk upon request. (PSSA 5)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) is hereby ALLOWED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25 (d) Commissioner of Social Security Andrew Saul is substituted for Nancy Berryhill as the defendant in this action. The Clerk shall issue summons for service on the defendant. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshal Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, complaint, and this Order upon the defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service." (PSSA, 5)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action (McKillop, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (McKillop, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Iran Colon.(Valentine, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Iran Colon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Sheet)(Valentine, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iran Colon
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher A. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?