Petit-Homme v. State of Massachusetts
Plaintiff: Denver E Petit-Homme
Defendant: State of Massachusetts
Case Number: 1:2019cv11559
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Denver E Petit-Homme : 22 Beechwood Street Apt. 508 Boston MA 02121 (Montes, Mariliz)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees; or (2) move for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Failure of plaintiff to comply with this directive by Thursday, August 8, 2019 may result in the dismissal of this action. (PSSA, 3)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Denver E Petit-Homme.(Castilla, Francis) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Castilla, Francis).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petit-Homme v. State of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver E Petit-Homme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?