Lupis v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Alfred Lupis
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11582
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alfred Lupis. General Motors LLC waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ozzello, Mark)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tarek H. Zohdy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark A. Ozzello. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tarek Zohdy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7829723 by Alfred Lupis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Duggan, Benjamin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark A. Ozzello Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7803257 by Alfred Lupis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Duggan, Benjamin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7790247 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Alfred Lupis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Form)(Duggan, Benjamin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/22/2019 to correct PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupis v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Lupis
Represented By: Benjamin H. Duggan
Represented By: Mark A. Ozzello
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?