Turner v. Springfield Terminal Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Turner
Defendant: Pan Am Railways, Inc. and Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11592
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time (Garvin, Brendan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to October 4, 2019 to extend Defendants' responsive pleading deadline by Pan Am Railways, Inc., Springfield Terminal Railway Company.(Barrett, Jason)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Barrett on behalf of Pan Am Railways, Inc., Springfield Terminal Railway Company (Barrett, Jason)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pan Am Railways, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (MacAdam, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Springfield Terminal Railway Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (MacAdam, James)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7795007 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kelly Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(MacAdam, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Springfield Terminal Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Turner
Represented By: James J. MacAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Am Railways, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Represented By: Jason C. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?