Sills et al v. FMR LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cateenia D. Johnson, Regina Crystal Robinson and Tyler Wayne Sills
Defendant: National Financial Services LLC, Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, Inc., FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, Fidelity Management Trust Company, Fidelity Management & Research Company and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv11595
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John Welling Stewart. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Megan K. Mechak. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gregory McGillivary. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. consolidating case 19-11595-LTS with case no. 19-10335-LTS. All future filings should be made in the lead case 19-10335-LTS.(Simeone, Maria)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Welling Stewart Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7814396 by Cateenia D. Johnson, Regina Crystal Robinson, Tyler Wayne Sills. (Attachments: #1 Certification For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Keefe, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Megan K. Mechak Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7814388 by Cateenia D. Johnson, Regina Crystal Robinson, Tyler Wayne Sills. (Attachments: #1 Certification For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Keefe, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gregory McGillivary Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7814240 by Cateenia D. Johnson, Regina Crystal Robinson, Tyler Wayne Sills. (Attachments: #1 Certification For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Keefe, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 10/22/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, Inc., Fidelity Management & Research Company, Fidelity Management Trust Company, John and Jane Does 1-10, National Financial Services LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7795538 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cateenia D. Johnson, Regina Crystal Robinson, Tyler Wayne Sills. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Civil Category Form)(Keefe, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sills et al v. FMR LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Management Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Management & Research Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cateenia D. Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Keefe
Represented By: Megan K Mechak
Represented By: Gregory McGillivary
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Crystal Robinson
Represented By: Michael R. Keefe
Represented By: Megan K Mechak
Represented By: Gregory McGillivary
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Wayne Sills
Represented By: Michael R. Keefe
Represented By: Megan K Mechak
Represented By: Gregory McGillivary
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?