Breda v. Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dr John Breda
Defendant: Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11598
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Copy re #8 Notice of Scheduling Conference mailed to Dr. John Breda on 9/11/2019. (Belmont, Kellyann)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Please see attached notice. (Belmont, Kellyann)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company.. (Hamilton, Joseph)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (Hamilton, Joseph) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/2/2019) (Belmont, Kellyann).
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (MacDougall, Patricia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Hamilton, Joseph)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7795767 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Hamilton, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breda v. Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph M. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr John Breda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?