Toop v. Rollins
Plaintiff: Audra Toop
Defendant: Rachel Rollins
Case Number: 1:2019cv11602
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Copy re 7 Order mailed to Audra Toop on 9/6/2019., DOCKET SHEET sent (Danieli, Chris)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(g)(4), (5), this action shall be reassigned to Judge Denise Casper as related to Toop v. Rollins, C.A. No. 19-11062-DJC.(Danieli, Chris)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Remark: Certificate of Service filed by Audra Troop. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Audra Toop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lara, Miguel)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Audra Toop.(Castilla, Francis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for compulsory joinder of party for declaratory and injuctive relief by Audra Toop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Castilla, Francis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rachel Rollins, filed by Audra Toop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toop v. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Toop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?