Da Silveira v. Charles et al
Petitioner: Fabio H. Da Silveira
Respondent: Field Office Dir. Marcos Charles, Steven W. Tomkins and Yolanda Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv11620
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT Supplemental Status Report to ECF No. 10 by Fabio H. Da Silveira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Pomerleau, Todd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Joint JOINT STATEMENT of counsel (Joint Report). (Pomerleau, Todd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2019 re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Yolanda Smith...ORDERED: Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before 9/17/19, all matters under advisement,court adjourned. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Petition..... Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Fabio H. Da Silveira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pomerleau, Todd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Yolanda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sady, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Petition by Yolanda Smith.(Sady, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Lara, Miguel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Yolanda Smith (Sady, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Superintendent Smith shall be the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon Superintendent Smith and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondent shall, no later Friday, August 16, 2019, file a motion for the grant or denial of the petition and a memorandum in support thereof. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 3)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7802683 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Fabio H. Da Silveira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit)(Pomerleau, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Da Silveira v. Charles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Dir. Marcos Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven W. Tomkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yolanda Smith
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fabio H. Da Silveira
Represented By: Todd C. Pomerleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?