New England Wheels, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: New England Wheels, Inc. and Delphini, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11622
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court treats the Stipulation #9 filed by New England Wheels Inc. as a MOTION TO EXTEND TIME, which is granted. Delphini, L.L.C. answer/response due 11/4/2019. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by New England Wheels, Inc. re 8 Order,,, . (Michaelis, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend the Response Date for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by New England Wheels, Inc.. (Michaelis, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: It appears from ECF records that Defendant's information was improperly entered by Plaintiff's attorney. A limited liability company, like other entities, may not appear pro se. See Local Rule 83.5.5. Accordingly, the court has directed the clerk to correct the docket and remove the "pro se" appearance for Delphini, L.L.C. The court treats Plaintiff's #7 Unilateral Stipulation to Extend the Response Date as a motion to extend time. The motion is denied without prejudice for failure to include the required certificate of service on a party not served through the electronic filing system. See Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 5(a)(1)(D) & 5(d)(1)(B). Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Electronic Order on Delphini, L.L.C., in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(a)(1)(A), and file a certificate of service certifying such service. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend the Response Date for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by New England Wheels, Inc.. (Michaelis, Brian)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Lima, Christine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Delphini, L.L.C.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delphini, L.L.C. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7802775 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by New England Wheels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,139,136, #2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,393,910, #3 Exhibit Patent Assignment, #4 Exhibit June 19, 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit Screen Capture of Frontrunner Website, #6 Exhibit Ford E-Series Prior Art, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Sheet, )(Michaelis, Brian) Modified on 7/29/2019 to remove AO 120 form and to file as it's own entry (McDonagh, Christina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New England Wheels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Wheels, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michaelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphini, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?