Nyonton v. US.Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Jefferson Wansay Nyonton
Respondent: US.Department of Homeland Security and Thomas M. Hodgson
Case Number: 1:2019cv11630
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas M. Hodgson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Balakrishna, Annapurna)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas M. Hodgson.(Balakrishna, Annapurna)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT by Jefferson Wansay Nyonton. (Lima, Christine)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of Thomas M. Hodgson (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jefferson Wansay Nyonton. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jefferson Wansay Nyonton. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. (Attachments: #1 IFP application form)(PSSA, 4)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Castilla, Francis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Castilla, Francis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Jefferson Wansay Nyonton.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyonton v. US.Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US.Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas M. Hodgson
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jefferson Wansay Nyonton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?