Centaur Diagnostics, Inc. v. Mittel
Plaintiff: Centaur Diagnostics, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Louis Mittel
3Rd Party Defendant: Erik Duhaime, Ph.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11644
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Erik Duhaime, Ph.D., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Centaur Diagnostics, Inc. by Louis Mittel.(Davison, Juliet)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Third Party Defendant Erik Duhaime, Ph.D. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Erik Duhaime, Ph.D., COUNTERCLAIM against Centaur Diagnostics, Inc. by Louis Mittel.(Davison, Juliet)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Amended Complaint. Louis Mittel's response is due on or before 9/9/2019. (Zierk, Marsha)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to September 9, 2019 to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by Louis Mittel.(Davison, Juliet)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliet A. Davison on behalf of Louis Mittel (Davison, Juliet)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Louis Mittel, filed by Centaur Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hagan, Colin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Louis Mittel. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Centaur Diagnostics, Inc.. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Centaur Diagnostics, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Summons. (Hagan, Colin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis Mittel Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7808947 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Centaur Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Category Form, #5 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hagan, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centaur Diagnostics, Inc. v. Mittel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centaur Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Colin R. Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Louis Mittel
Represented By: Juliet A. Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Erik Duhaime, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?