Downey v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: Thomas Armstrong, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, AUSA Andrew E Lelling, United States of America, William Barr, L Rafael Reifm, Paul Wolfteich and Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv11651
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 19-1943 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Downey. (Paine, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Copy re [Dkt # 10] Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis mailed to Mark Downey on 9/19/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The motion to appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED. "An appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if the trial court certifies in writing that it is not taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); see also Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A). Regardless of any subjective good faith on the part of the appellant, good faith within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) is only demonstrated when a litigant seeks appellate review of any issue not frivolous. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 445 (1962). An issue is frivolous if no reasonable person could suppose [it] to have any merit. Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025, 1026 (7th Cir. 2000). For the reasons set forth in the court's order that this action be dismissed, the court certifies that this appeal is not taken in good faith. The clerk shall transmit a copy of this Order to the United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. If Downey wishes to pursue his appeal, he may pay the appeal fee, or, within 30 days, file a motion to appeal in forma pauperis with the First Circuit. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(5). (Pacho, Arnold)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Pacho, Arnold)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order Dismissing Case, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter from COA Clerk's Office) (Pacho, Arnold)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASEAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-11650-RGS, 1:19-cv-11651-RGS(PSSA, 3)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting (3) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in case 1:19-cv-11650-RGS; granting (4) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in case 1:19-cv-11651-RGS. Both of these actions shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Downey is hereby warned that that he could be subject to monetary and non-monetary sanctions in this court if he continues to file pleadings in this court that have already been decided by this or another court, or that are otherwise malicious, frivolous, or abusive, or fail to set forth a short and plain statement of his claims. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-11650-RGS, 1:19-cv-11651-RGS(PSSA, 3)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 supporting IFP)(Castilla, Francis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Hearing by Mark Downey.(Castilla, Francis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash Sovereing Immunity, Motion to Accomadate the Disabled, Motion to Expedite and Seal, Motion to Refer Criminal case to US Attorney, Motion to Designate the Primary Defedant class Action Claim by Mark Downey.(Castilla, Francis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #3 Complaint) (Castilla, Francis).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSA Andrew E Lelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Rafael Reifm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Wolfteich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?