Luna v. Carbonite, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ruben A. Luna
Defendant: Mohamad S. Ali, Anthony Folger and Carbonite, Inc.
Petitioner: Tom Johnatan Or-Paz
Case Number: 1:2019cv11662
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Shannon L. Hopkins in Support re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Tom Johnatan Or-Paz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification, #2 Exhibit Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit LK Resume)(Hopkins, Shannon)
September 29, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Tom Johnatan Or-Paz. (Hopkins, Shannon)
September 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff ( Responses due by 10/15/2019) by Tom Johnatan Or-Paz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Shannon)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anthony Folger served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mohamad S. Ali served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 10/31/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7812185 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ruben A. Luna. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Certificate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Categiry Form)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. Carbonite, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben A. Luna
Represented By: Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamad S. Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbonite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tom Johnatan Or-Paz
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?