CET Group USA, Inc. v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: CET Group USA, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Gregory A. Richardson
Case Number: 1:2019cv11665
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Kevin K. McAleenan, Gregory A. Richardson, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Kanwit, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CET Group USA, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CET Group USA, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CET Group USA, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by CET Group USA, Inc.. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Drago, Anthony)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Review under the APA against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7812985 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by CET Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Drago, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CET Group USA, Inc. v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CET Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Drago, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Richardson
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?