Jean-Michel v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jamesy Jean-Michel
Defendant: DLA Piper LLP (US), DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan and Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11699
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 21, 2019 to File Response/Reply by DLA Piper LLP (US), DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan.(Sumner, Michelle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Emily M. Steiner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7910832 by DLA Piper LLP (US), DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michelle Sumner, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Emily Steiner)(Sumner, Michelle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ian C. Taylor Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7910758 by DLA Piper LLP (US), DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michelle Sumner, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Ian Taylor)(Sumner, Michelle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Sumner on behalf of DLA Piper LLP (US), DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan (Sumner, Michelle)
August 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jamesy Jean-Michel. DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Rafik, Mala)
August 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jamesy Jean-Michel. DLA Piper LLP (US) waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Rafik, Mala)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, DLA Piper LLP (US), DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7819522 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jamesy Jean-Michel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Rafik, Mala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean-Michel v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLA Piper LLP (US)
Represented By: Michelle L. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLA Piper Non Partners PPO Anthem Plan
Represented By: Michelle L. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamesy Jean-Michel
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?