Rossman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Tobin Rossman
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage-Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-EMX3
Case Number: 1:2019cv11704
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Reset Deadlines: Joint tatus Report due by 1/31/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Joint Motion to Stay Case. The parties shall file a joint status report on the earlier of January 31, 2020 or the First Circuit's resolution of the case giving rise to the stay. Additionally, the parties shall file a further status report thereafter every ninety days while the stay remains in effect. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage-Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-EMX3, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fialkow, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/6/19 to respond to amended complaint. (Simeone, Maria)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 6, 2019 to Respond to Amended Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage-Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-EMX3, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fialkow, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Fialkow, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, US. Bank National Association Asset Security Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage-Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-EMX3, filed by Mary Tobin Rossman.(Dion, Todd) Modified on 8/14/2019 to correct description (Montes, Mariliz).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage-Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-EMX3, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7820767 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Fialkow, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage-Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-EMX3
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tobin Rossman
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?