elliot et al v. Pinnacle Medical Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Faisal Malik and jamie elliot
Defendant: Blueprint Healthcare LLC, Akindele Majekdunmi, Pinnacle Medical Group LLC and Akindele Majekodunmi
Case Number: 1:2019cv11709
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting #11 Assented Motion to Continue 16.b scheduling conference. 16.b Scheduling Conference reset from 10/22/19 to 11/13/2019 03:15 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. No further continuances will be entertained. (Molloy, Maryellen)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Continue to 11/02/19 by Blueprint Healthcare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dennehy, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented To Motion to continue 16.b conference.... Scheduling Conference reset from 9/23/19 to 10/22/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/23/19 to 10/02/19 by Pinnacle Medical Group LLC.(Dennehy, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Moeslinger, Raven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Dennehy, John)
August 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Jamie Elliot.(Moeslinger, Raven)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Blueprint Healthcare LLC.(Dennehy, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blueprint Healthcare LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7821768 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 JS45, #4 Supplement)(Dennehy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: elliot et al v. Pinnacle Medical Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blueprint Healthcare LLC
Represented By: John W. Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akindele Majekdunmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Medical Group LLC
Represented By: John W. Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akindele Majekodunmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faisal Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: jamie elliot
Represented By: Raven Moeslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?